THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bond University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Davies clinic at 38 Bridgeport Road East, Waterloo N2J 2J5 (health custodian of the records)
Date Received: 30 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bond University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Davies clinic at 38 Bridgeport Road East, Waterloo N2J 2J5 (health custodian of the records)
Date Received: 30 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bond University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2022