THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:07:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDELAZIZ TARIQ M SAGGA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SAGGA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. SAGGA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SAGGA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SAGGA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SAGGA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SAGGA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDELAZIZ TARIQ M SAGGA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SAGGA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. SAGGA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SAGGA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SAGGA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SAGGA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SAGGA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025