THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Católica de Santa María Facultad de Medicina Humana, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN- Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Católica de Santa María Facultad de Medicina Humana, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN- Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAURICIO ALEJANDRO MIRANDA CAM may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MIRANDA CAM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MIRANDA CAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MIRANDA CAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MIRANDA CAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MIRANDA CAM ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MIRANDA CAM ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAURICIO ALEJANDRO MIRANDA CAM may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MIRANDA CAM is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MIRANDA CAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MIRANDA CAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MIRANDA CAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MIRANDA CAM ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MIRANDA CAM ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Católica de Santa María Facultad de Medicina Humana, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
18 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2024 to 17 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
29 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2023 to 28 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
29 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
06 Sep 2022 to 28 Nov 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
24 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
01 Sep 2020 to 23 Nov 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 18 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 17 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 29 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 28 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 29 Nov 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Nephrology
DATE: 06 Sep 2022 to 28 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 24 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Sep 2020 to 23 Nov 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2022