THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:21:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LULWA A Y M A ALDUAIJ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALDUAIJ is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALDUAIJ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALDUAIJ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALDUAIJ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALDUAIJ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALDUAIJ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 18 November, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LULWA A Y M A ALDUAIJ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALDUAIJ is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALDUAIJ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALDUAIJ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALDUAIJ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALDUAIJ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALDUAIJ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 18 November, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 18 Nov 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
19 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 18 Nov 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
06 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2023 to 05 Oct 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
06 Oct 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2021 to 05 Oct 2021
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
18 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
06 Oct 2020 to 17 Nov 2020
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 18 Nov 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 19 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 18 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 06 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 05 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 06 Oct 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 05 Oct 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 18 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 06 Oct 2020 to 17 Nov 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 18 Nov 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 18 Nov 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2020