THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:58:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Andres Bello, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Neurology
5EC 306
Toronto Ontario M5G
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3662
Fax: 416-340-3738

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 13 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Andres Bello, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Neurology
5EC 306
Toronto Ontario M5G
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3662
Fax: 416-340-3738

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 13 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Feb 2025
12 Feb 2032
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 13 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 12 2032
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JUAN FRANCISCO IDIAQUEZ RIOS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. IDIAQUEZ RIOS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. IDIAQUEZ RIOS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. IDIAQUEZ RIOS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. IDIAQUEZ RIOS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 13 February, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 12 February, 2032.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. JUAN FRANCISCO IDIAQUEZ RIOS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. IDIAQUEZ RIOS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. IDIAQUEZ RIOS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. IDIAQUEZ RIOS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. IDIAQUEZ RIOS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 13 February, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 12 February, 2032.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Andres Bello, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 12 Feb 2032

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2020