THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:43:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Synergy Sports Medicine and Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto ON M6H 1V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-2017 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Synergy Sports Medicine and Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto ON M6H 1V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: 9058487100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-2017 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK JONATHAN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK JONATHAN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2020