THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:38:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Antioquia, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Antioquia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Antioquia, 2001
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 19 Oct 2022
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
24 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 19 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 24 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021