THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:07:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GK Tyagi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tyagi (CPSO#: 123274 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
4167473400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GK Tyagi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tyagi (CPSO#: 123274 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
Emergency Department
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
4167473400

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Mar 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 08 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GAURAV KERN TYAGI may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GAURAV KERN TYAGI may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2020