THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 15 Apr 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Mar 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
10 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 09 Jul 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
01 Apr 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 15 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 10 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 09 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Apr 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Apr 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2021