THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital
Neurology
Neuromuscular Center
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 19239
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 05 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital
Neurology
Neuromuscular Center
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 19239
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 05 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 05 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Oct 2023
30 Aug 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 27 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALBERTO ALEMAN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. ALEMAN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ALEMAN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ALEMAN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ALEMAN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 05 October, 2022, and expires on 30 August, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. ALEMAN's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ALBERTO ALEMAN may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. ALEMAN holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ALEMAN no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ALEMAN’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ALEMAN’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 05 October, 2022, and expires on 30 August, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. ALEMAN's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Aug 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020