THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:53:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 Drummond St W
Perth Smiths Falls District Hospital
Dept of Surgery
Perth ON K7H 2K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-264-5558
Fax: 613-718-0705

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 28 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 Drummond St W
Perth Smiths Falls District Hospital
Dept of Surgery
Perth ON K7H 2K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-264-5558
Fax: 613-718-0705

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 28 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 28 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELISABETH GRACE MCLAREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAREN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELISABETH GRACE MCLAREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCLAREN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2020