THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:49:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Geriatric Medicine
20 Nov 2023 to 10 Dec 2023
University of Ottawa
EL - Geriatric Medicine
19 Oct 2020 to 15 Nov 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 20 Nov 2023 to 10 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 19 Oct 2020 to 15 Nov 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Nov 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2020