THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:35:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Sunnyside Dr
St George Medical Centre
St George ON N0E 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194483331
Fax: 226-400-0089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Sunnyside Dr
St George Medical Centre
St George ON N0E 1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194483331
Fax: 226-400-0089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALASTAIR CAMERON HUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALASTAIR CAMERON HUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2021