THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 13:38:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: Fuks, Yolana (Used Until: 15 Sep 2020)
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh ON N8N 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 739 1805
Fax: 519 735 3287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 16 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Fuks, Yolana (Used Until: 15 Sep 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh ON N8N 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 739 1805
Fax: 519 735 3287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Feb 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 16 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOLANA ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOLANA ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2021