THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:21:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nilratan Sircar Medical College, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 61354966664318
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Nilratan Sircar Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 61354966664318
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jun 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DURJOY LAHIRI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, at Queen's University, in which Dr. LAHIRI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. LAHIRI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. LAHIRI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. LAHIRI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 May, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. LAHIRI's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DURJOY LAHIRI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Neurology, at Queen's University, in which Dr. LAHIRI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. LAHIRI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. LAHIRI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. LAHIRI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 16 May, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. LAHIRI's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nilratan Sircar Medical College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2021