THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:29:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients may request a copy of their medical record by contacting:

York Medical Health services
11730 Leslie Street
Newmarket, ON
L3Y 3E4
Ph#: 905-853-0404
Date Received: 12 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients may request a copy of their medical record by contacting:

York Medical Health services
11730 Leslie Street
Newmarket, ON
L3Y 3E4
Ph#: 905-853-0404
Date Received: 12 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Nov 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 10 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MALPREET LIDDER may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MALPREET LIDDER may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2021