THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:35:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: W 12Th-899 12Th Ave W
VGH Department of Radiology
Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 604-875-4111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neuroradiology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neuroradiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: W 12Th-899 12Th Ave W
VGH Department of Radiology
Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 604-875-4111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neuroradiology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neuroradiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA TALIA VERTINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERTINSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA TALIA VERTINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERTINSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2021