THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:44:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Isfahan University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Isfahan University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYYEDEH FATEMEH BAHARI SARAVI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BAHARI SARAVI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. BAHARI SARAVI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BAHARI SARAVI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BAHARI SARAVI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BAHARI SARAVI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BAHARI SARAVI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYYEDEH FATEMEH BAHARI SARAVI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BAHARI SARAVI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. BAHARI SARAVI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BAHARI SARAVI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BAHARI SARAVI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BAHARI SARAVI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BAHARI SARAVI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Isfahan University, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
27 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 26 Sep 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
27 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 26 Sep 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
27 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 26 Sep 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
21 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
AVP - Psychiatry
29 Sep 2022 to 20 Dec 2022
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 17 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
31 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Nov 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
24 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
01 Dec 2020 to 23 Feb 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 27 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 26 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 27 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 26 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 27 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 26 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 21 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: AVP - Psychiatry
DATE: 29 Sep 2022 to 20 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 17 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 31 Jan 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 24 Feb 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Dec 2020 to 23 Feb 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2020