THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:07:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: Chun, Wo Jin Kevin (Used Until: 27 Mar 2024)
Medical School: Western University, 2024
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Road
Parkwood Institute
Department of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
N6C 0A7
London Ontario N6C 4R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-4000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Chun, Wo Jin Kevin (Used Until: 27 Mar 2024)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2024

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Road
Parkwood Institute
Department of Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
N6C 0A7
London Ontario N6C 4R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-4000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIN JEON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JEON is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. JEON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JEON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JEON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JEON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JEON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIN JEON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JEON is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. JEON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JEON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JEON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JEON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JEON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2024
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024