THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:38:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: K.J. Somaiya Medical College, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
uOttawa – The Ottawa Hospital
Radiology - Department of Medical Imaging
Box 232, General Campus Room 1466e
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-978-9964
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: K.J. Somaiya Medical College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
uOttawa – The Ottawa Hospital
Radiology - Department of Medical Imaging
Box 232, General Campus Room 1466e
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-978-9964
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJIV SUBHASH HIRA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. HIRA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. HIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. HIRA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. HIRA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJIV SUBHASH HIRA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. HIRA is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. HIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. HIRA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. HIRA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: K.J. Somaiya Medical College, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
15 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2022 to 14 Oct 2022
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
11 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
15 Oct 2021 to 10 Dec 2021
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 15 Oct 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 14 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 11 Dec 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 15 Oct 2021 to 10 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2021