THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:06:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ha’il, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ha’il, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ha’il, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2024 to 07 Jul 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
08 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2023 to 07 Jul 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
24 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 07 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 08 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 07 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 24 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2021