THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:30:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Delta Park Boulevard
Sakura Medical Center - Nephrology Clinic
Regional Kidney Wellness Centre
Unit 8
Brampton Ontario L6T 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-638-2000
Extension: 1
Fax: 289-498-1925

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 31 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Nephrology
Effective: 31 Dec 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215 Delta Park Boulevard
Sakura Medical Center - Nephrology Clinic
Regional Kidney Wellness Centre
Unit 8
Brampton Ontario L6T 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-638-2000
Extension: 1
Fax: 289-498-1925

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 31 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Nephrology
Effective: 31 Dec 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
31 Oct 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 31 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SABAA ASIF may practise medicine independently in nephrology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SABAA ASIF may practise medicine independently in nephrology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2021