THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:30:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAIKHAH A A A ALDEI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALDEI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALDEI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALDEI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALDEI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALDEI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALDEI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAIKHAH A A A ALDEI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALDEI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. ALDEI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALDEI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALDEI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALDEI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALDEI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
08 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 07 Jan 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
14 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 14 May 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
15 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
24 Jul 2021 to 14 May 2022
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2021 to 23 Jul 2021
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
09 Jun 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 08 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 07 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 14 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 14 May 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 15 May 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 24 Jul 2021 to 14 May 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 23 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 09 Jun 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2021