Medical School:
University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery |
13 Feb 2026 to 30 Jun 2026 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 12 Feb 2026 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery |
20 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 19 Dec 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
20 Dec 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 19 Dec 2023 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
13 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 12 Sep 2022 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery |
13 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
McMaster University |
PEAP - R - General Surgery |
13 Jul 2021 to 12 Sep 2021 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE:
13 Feb 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 12 Feb 2026
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE:
20 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 19 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
20 Dec 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 19 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
13 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 12 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE:
13 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - R - General Surgery
DATE:
13 Jul 2021 to 12 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University