THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:10:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Hematology/Oncology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Hematology/Oncology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGGIE LYNN MCNEILL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MCNEILL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MCNEILL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MCNEILL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MCNEILL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MCNEILL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MCNEILL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGGIE LYNN MCNEILL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MCNEILL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MCNEILL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MCNEILL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MCNEILL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MCNEILL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MCNEILL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
21 Nov 2021 to 18 Dec 2021
McMaster University
EL - Pediatrics
24 Oct 2021 to 19 Nov 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 21 Nov 2021 to 18 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatrics
DATE: 24 Oct 2021 to 19 Nov 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2021