THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:14:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Welland Hospital
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7097703407
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 1J4
Phone: 7097703407
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Third St
Welland Hospital Site
General Internal Medicine
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Third Street
Welland Hospital
Welland Ontario L3B 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7097703407
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5546 Portage Road
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 1J4
Phone: 7097703407
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Third St
Welland Hospital Site
General Internal Medicine
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMSEY GREGORY GERARD POWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAMSEY GREGORY GERARD POWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2023