Medical School:
Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine |
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Ottawa |
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine |
08 Apr 2021 to 30 Jun 2021 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine
DATE:
08 Apr 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa