THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:21:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2024
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2024

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON THOMPSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. THOMPSON is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. THOMPSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. THOMPSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. THOMPSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. THOMPSON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. THOMPSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASON THOMPSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. THOMPSON is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. THOMPSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. THOMPSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. THOMPSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. THOMPSON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. THOMPSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2024
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024