THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:28:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Norman Street
Bluewater Health
Mental Health and Addictions
Russell Building
Sarnia Ontario N7T
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194644400
Extension: 5379
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Jul 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Norman Street
Bluewater Health
Mental Health and Addictions
Russell Building
Sarnia Ontario N7T
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194644400
Extension: 5379
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Jul 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL JAMES KOVAL may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL JAMES KOVAL may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Jun 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2021