THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:46:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
Kingston ON L4A 4S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Nov 2024

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
Kingston ON L4A 4S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Nov 2024

Corporation Name: Abraham, Islam, Mussari, Soboleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASSAN DOUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASSAN DOUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2021