THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:41:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 29 Mar 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 29 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 29 Mar 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 29 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Jan 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 26 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SARA TEHSEEN ALI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SARA TEHSEEN ALI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2021