THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:58:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jazan University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jazan University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jazan University, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 27 Sep 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
28 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 27 Sep 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
03 May 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 27 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 28 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 27 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
DATE: 03 May 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2021