THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:00:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Ave
Hotel Dieu Shaver Hospital
St. Catharines ON L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 685-1381
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Ave
Hotel Dieu Shaver Hospital
St. Catharines ON L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 685-1381
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston General Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM MOHAMMED HUMAID AL QAMSHOOEI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARYAM MOHAMMED HUMAID AL QAMSHOOEI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI is enrolled at Queen's University;
(2) Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL QAMSHOOEI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
29 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 29 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 28 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023