Medical School:
Government Medical College Amritsar, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
06 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Queen's University |
AVP - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 05 Nov 2024 |
Queen's University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
06 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 05 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University