THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:00:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 18 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 18 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
EL - Cardiology
17 Jan 2024 to 13 Feb 2024
Western University
EL - Cardiology
25 Oct 2023 to 21 Nov 2023
University of Ottawa
EL - Critical Care Medicine
31 Jan 2021 to 13 Feb 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
EL - Critical Care Medicine
31 Jan 2021 to 13 Feb 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
EL - Cardiology
31 Jan 2021 to 13 Feb 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
EL - Cardiology
11 Jan 2021 to 30 Jan 2021
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 17 Jan 2024 to 13 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 25 Oct 2023 to 21 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 31 Jan 2021 to 13 Feb 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 31 Jan 2021 to 13 Feb 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 31 Jan 2021 to 13 Feb 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 11 Jan 2021 to 30 Jan 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Feb 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2021