THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:10:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Khalid University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Khalid University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAKAN SAEED MOHAMMAD ALQAHTANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALQAHTANI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALQAHTANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALQAHTANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALQAHTANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAKAN SAEED MOHAMMAD ALQAHTANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALQAHTANI is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALQAHTANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALQAHTANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALQAHTANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALQAHTANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Khalid University College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Adult Hepatology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
27 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 26 Aug 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Hepatology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology
DATE: 27 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 26 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023