THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 09:24:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 318 Stewart St
Peterborough ON K9J 3N1
Phone: (705) 874 0160
Fax: (705) 536 0220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KJ KRIESEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 318 Stewart St
Peterborough ON K9J 3N1
Phone: (705) 874 0160
Fax: (705) 536 0220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 23 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For patients seeking access to their medical records or for any related inquiries, please contact Records Management LTD at:

Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Mailing Address: 1 High Meadow Place, Suite #13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 31 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KJ KRIESEL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Mar 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KEVIN JOHN KRIESEL may practise medicine independently in otolaryngology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KEVIN JOHN KRIESEL may practise medicine independently in otolaryngology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Mar 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2021