THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Emory University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Emory University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court St N
Thunder Bay ON P7A 4V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 05 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. STEVEN LEONARD COHEN may practise medicine independently in Internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. STEVEN LEONARD COHEN may practise medicine independently in Internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Emory University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 May 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jan 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 May 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2021