THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISAL F S SH M ALFADLI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALFADLI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALFADLI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALFADLI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALFADLI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALFADLI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALFADLI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAISAL F S SH M ALFADLI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALFADLI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALFADLI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALFADLI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALFADLI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALFADLI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALFADLI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
16 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
16 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 15 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
16 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2023 to 15 Jul 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
09 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2021 to 08 Aug 2021
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
17 May 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 16 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 15 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 16 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 15 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 16 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 15 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 09 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 08 Aug 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 17 May 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 May 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2021