THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:51:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Infectious Diseases Division
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306043
Fax: 4165306050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Infectious Diseases Division
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306043
Fax: 4165306050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 01 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANNE TAN ZANORIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANORIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANNE TAN ZANORIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANORIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2021