THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:24:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grigorian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grigorian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Sep 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2021