THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:49:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Centre
Psychiatry
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519.824.1010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Centre
Psychiatry
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 18883502323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Centre
Psychiatry
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519.824.1010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Centre
Psychiatry
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 18883502323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERIEF EL-GAALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-GAALY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERIEF EL-GAALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-GAALY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2021