THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:26:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 83 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON N2G 1A7
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 Maplewood Ave
York ON M6C 4B3
Phone: 416-979-7027
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Antonio Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 83 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON N2G 1A7
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary's General Hospital
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: 519-744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 Maplewood Ave
York ON M6C 4B3
Phone: 416-979-7027
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Antonio Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONGWOO ANTONIO LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONGWOO ANTONIO LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2021