THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:20:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 26 Jul 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
08 Oct 2021 to 31 May 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
16 Jul 2021 to 07 Oct 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 26 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 08 Oct 2021 to 31 May 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 16 Jul 2021 to 07 Oct 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2021