THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:17:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Showa University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 24 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Showa University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Gastroenterology
Effective: 24 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Apr 2024
31 Mar 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 24 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Mar 31 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. YUSUKE FUJIYOSHI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. FUJIYOSHI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. FUJIYOSHI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. FUJIYOSHI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. FUJIYOSHI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 24 April, 2024, and expires on 31 March, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. FUJIYOSHI's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. YUSUKE FUJIYOSHI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Gastroenterology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. FUJIYOSHI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. FUJIYOSHI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. FUJIYOSHI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. FUJIYOSHI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 24 April, 2024, and expires on 31 March, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. FUJIYOSHI's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Showa University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Mar 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2021