Medical School:
Imam Abdulrahman Bin Faisal University College of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery |
12 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 11 Apr 2026 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery |
12 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 11 Apr 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery |
12 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 11 Apr 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery |
12 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 11 Apr 2023 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery |
12 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022 |
McMaster University |
PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery |
18 Jan 2022 to 11 Apr 2022 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
12 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 11 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
12 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 11 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
12 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 11 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
12 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 11 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
12 Apr 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - R - Cardiac Surgery
DATE:
18 Jan 2022 to 11 Apr 2022
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University