Medical School:
Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
31 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 May 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
31 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 May 2023 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
01 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
24 Aug 2021 to 30 May 2022 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism |
01 Jun 2021 to 23 Aug 2021 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
31 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 May 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
31 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 May 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
01 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
24 Aug 2021 to 30 May 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE:
01 Jun 2021 to 23 Aug 2021
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto