THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:16:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Dundas St W
Mount Sinai Fertility
Obstetrics & Gynaecology, University of Toronto
Toronto ON M5T 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4748
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Dundas St W
Mount Sinai Fertility
Obstetrics & Gynaecology, University of Toronto
Toronto ON M5T 2Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4748
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 May 2024
31 Aug 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 21 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 31 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. EVGENIA MICHAELI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology, Division of Reproductive Endocrinology and Infertility, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MICHAELI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MICHAELI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MICHAELI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MICHAELI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 September, 2023, and expires on 24 September, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. MICHAELI's academic appointment at the University of Toronto, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. EVGENIA MICHAELI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology, Division of Reproductive Endocrinology and Infertility, University of Toronto, in which Dr. MICHAELI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. MICHAELI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. MICHAELI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. MICHAELI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 25 September, 2023, and expires on 24 September, 2030. Upon renewal of Dr. MICHAELI's academic appointment at the University of Toronto, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 24 Sep 2030
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 24 Sep 2030

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021