Medical School:
Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery |
13 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery |
31 Jul 2025 to 12 Apr 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jul 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery |
31 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jul 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery |
31 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jul 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery |
31 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jul 2022 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery |
26 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery |
03 Jun 2021 to 25 Aug 2021 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
13 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
31 Jul 2025 to 12 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
31 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
31 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
31 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
26 Aug 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
03 Jun 2021 to 25 Aug 2021
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto