THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:26:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: Steg, Or (Used Until: 09 Jun 2021)
Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Steg, Or (Used Until: 09 Jun 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OR STEG SABAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. STEG SABAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. STEG SABAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STEG SABAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. STEG SABAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. STEG SABAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. STEG SABAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OR STEG SABAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. STEG SABAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. STEG SABAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STEG SABAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. STEG SABAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. STEG SABAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. STEG SABAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hadassah Medical School, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021